This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/12/2020 at 19:30:54 (UTC).

SOFI LENDING CORP. VS TIMOTHY REED

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SOFI LENDING CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TIMOTHY REED. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6620

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SoFi LENDING CORP.

Defendant

TIMOTHY REED

Cypress, TX 77429

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

FORSBERG, KEVIN ANDREW

Attorney at THE FORSBERG LAW FIRM PC

15899 Hwy 105 West

Montgomery, TX 77356

 

Court Documents

SOFI_REED,TIMOTHY_AGREED JUDGMENT.pdf

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

REED_PLT MFC.pdf

Motion for Continuance: PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

REED_PLT MFC ORDER.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

Reed_Original Answer.pdf

Answer

5502678-37003663-jZDsCUl8XbcMicS.pdf

Return of Service

reed1_20200325143435.PDF

Certificate of Written Discovery: Plaintiff's Certificate of Unfiled Discovery

reed2_20200325143447.PDF

Response: Plaintiff's Responses to RFD

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO EZM

5502678-36239580-Unfiled Original Petition-uuo0DMYvrkRJkzf.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5502678_SZ8FXrnDyvmhEHI.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance: PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery: Plaintiff's Certificate of Unfiled Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: Plaintiff's Responses to RFD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: MAIL TO EZM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less