This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 18:46:01 (UTC).

SOFI LENDING CORP. VS KIMBERLEY HARDEMAN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SOFI LENDING CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIMBERLEY HARDEMAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6622

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SoFi Lending Corp.

Defendant

KIMBERLEY HARDEMAN

Houston, TX 77096

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

Defendant Attorney

WESTON, MICHAEL WAYNE

177 W Gray St.

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

20670-Suggestion of BK 2 - TX - County.pdf

Suggestion of Bankruptcy (OCA)

SOFI_HARDEMAN,KIMBERLEY_Motion to Dismiss WITHOUT Prejudice.pdf

Motion to Dismiss: AND PROPOSED ORDER

SOFI_HARDEMAN,KIMBERLEY_Motion to Dismiss WITHOUT Prejudice.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

20670-Answer - TX - County.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

20670-Notice of Appearance - County.pdf

Notice of Appearance: Notice of Appearance

5502682-36941723-Rtk2mnjCBSfyqEx.pdf

Citation Returned: Unserved

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

5502682-36239607-Unfiled Original Petition-dpo1PvaTSjuUI4F.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5502682_48atLxFdAQX2zw0.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketReactivated Case (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: AND PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O EZ MESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less