This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2020 at 23:14:29 (UTC).

SOFI LENDING CORP. VS BRANDEN WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SOFI LENDING CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRANDEN WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6630

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SoFi LENDING CORP.

Defendant

BRANDEN WILLIAMS

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Sharrard D

Attorney at ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

14090 Sw Freeway, Suite 408

Sugarland, TX 77478

 

Court Documents

5502693-36880908-yLXVj4lnKi4TCKW.pdf

Citation Returned: Unserved

5502693 - CPR.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: 5502693 CITATION REQUEST

20200225_SOFI_WILLIAMS,BRANDEN_AJ.pdf

Proposed Order: Agreed Judgment

20200225_SOFI_WILLIAMS,BRANDEN_AJ.pdf

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

20200312_SOFI_WILLIAMS,BRANDEN_RULE 11.pdf

Rule 11 Agreement: (AJ 2-26-20)

5502693 - CPR.pdf

Alias Citation to be Issued

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

5502693-36239682-Unfiled Original Petition-aQwSqBHVflpCNIA.pdf

eFile Original Petition

5502693_ssAja1gfdzVSrb3.pdf

Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement: (AJ 2-26-20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: 5502693 CITATION REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TO EZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less