This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/04/2021 at 16:36:12 (UTC).

SIGNAD, LTD. VS JAMES R. WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 SIGNAD, LTD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAMES R WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGE BARNSTONE and AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4312

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

GEORGE BARNSTONE

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SignAd, Ltd.

Defendant

James R. Williams

George West, TX 78022

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melendez, Rich

P O Box 591249

Houston, TX 77259

 

Court Documents

Nonsuit.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

Order - Nonsuit.pdf

Proposed Order

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non Suit- Sent to Judge

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Proof of Trial.pdf

Notice: Proof of Service - Trial

Mtn for PJ Default.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment: Plaintiff's Motion for Post Answer Default Judgment

Final Judgment.pdf

Proposed Order: Order

Letter

Letter

P's Resp Mtn to Transfer.pdf

Response: to Defendant's Motion to Transfer

Order - P's Mtn to Transfer.pdf

Proposed Order

Letter

Letter

Answer

Answer

Letter

Letter

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment: Plaintiff's Motion for Post Answer Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Proof of Service - Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: to Defendant's Motion to Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CERTIFIED MAIL TRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SignAd, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dispute Resolution Center is a litigant