This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/16/2023 at 05:03:07 (UTC).

SHOAIB AHMEN VS LATRISH TARHINI

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 SHOAIB AHMEN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LATRISH TARHINI. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4465

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shoaib Ahmen

Katy, TX 77450

Defendant

Latrish Tarhini

Houston, TX 77084

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donati, Keith S

Attorney at Donati, Brashear Law Firm

410 W. Grand Parkway S., Ste. 104

Katy, TX 77494

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal, Granting Possession and to Withdraw Funds (submitted)

Order to Withdraw Funds

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

proposed Order of Dismissal, Granting Possession and to Withdraw Funds Held in the Court's Registry

Proposed Order: Proposed Order for Dismissal, Granting Possession and to Withdraw Funds

Notice of Zoom Hearing

Notice of Hearing: Set january 10, 2023 at 11:45 AM

proposed Order

Motion to Dismiss: Motion for Dismissal and for Writ of Possession

Motion for Dismissal and for Writ of Possession

Motion to Dismiss: Motion for Dismissal and for Writ of Possession

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY LATRISH TARHINI

JP Notice of Trial Setting

JP Notice of Trial Setting: #2

JP Notice of Trial Setting

JP Notice of Trial Setting: #1

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A: #2

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A

JP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A: #1

JP Citation

JP Citation

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order for Dismissal, Granting Possession and to Withdraw Funds

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: Set january 10, 2023 at 11:45 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss: Motion for Dismissal and for Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP CASE: 2252003056999 VOUCHER ID # 00924446 $1,850.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Receipts: $1,850.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting: #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting: #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A: #2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Officer's Sworn Request for Alt Svc Under Rule 742A: #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEviction Letter: FILED BY LATRISH TARHINI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less