This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 15:58:25 (UTC).

SHELL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS JULIE ANNE MCLAUGHLIN,SEAN P. MCLAUGHLIN

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SHELL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JULIE ANNE MCLAUGHLIN,SEAN P MCLAUGHLIN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6585

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shell Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Julie Anne McLaughlin

Houston, TX 77089

Sean P. McLaughlin

Houston, TX 77089

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DonCarlos, Stephen H.

Attorney at Reid,Strickland & Gillette, L.L.P

P.O. Box 809

Baytown, TX 77522-0809

 

Court Documents

Citation Return

Return of Service

Motion for Continuance - Vacation Letter

Motion for Continuance

Proposed Order

Proposed Order

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: Unserved

Request for Issuance of 106 Citation

Rule 106 Citation to be Issued

Motion for Substituted Service

Motion for Substituted Service

Proposed Order

Proposed Order: for Substituted Service

Order for Rule 106

Order for Rule 106: Granted

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

20191205104719.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 106 Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less