This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/14/2020 at 22:54:39 (UTC).

SHELL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS JOEL BRETT ELKINS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SHELL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOEL BRETT ELKINS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6588

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shell Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Joel Brett Elkins

La Porte, TX 77571

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DonCarlos, Stephen H.

Attorney at Reid,Strickland & Gillette, L.L.P

P.O. Box 809

Baytown, TX 77522-0809

 

Court Documents

elkins motion.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

elkins order.pdf

Proposed Order

NS - sent to Judge

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Citation Return

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

20191205104700.pdf

eFile Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less