This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/08/2017 at 19:19:45 (UTC).

SHELDON ISD V. ABCO LEASING INC ETAL ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2010 SHELDON ISD filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against ABCO LEASING INC ETAL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA STOREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7274

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA STOREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHELDON ISD

Defendants

BI-WAY CONCR PUMPING INC

ABCO LEASING INC ETAL

350 No St Paul St

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darlow, Michael J

Defendant Attorney

MCDANIEL, TIMOTHY M.

400 Louisiana Street Suite 1800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Notice

Notice: OF HEARING ON REQ INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO SECT 33.41D AND C TX PRO TAX CODE Film code Number 779952864

Cash Receipt

Cash Receipt: CR #666817 NO FEE PAID BY PERDUE BRANDON FIELDER SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHO VS BI-WAY CONCRETE PUMPING TAX SUIT NO FEE DUE SEE SEC.33.34 OF PROPERTY CODE Film code Number 779901069

Original Petition (Filing Fee)

Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED TAX CASE SHELDON INDEP SCHOOL DIST VS BI-WAY CONCRETE PUMPING INC ETAL Film code Number 779901070

Order

Order: FOREGOING APPL FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF GRANTED Film code Number 781815638

Answer

Answer: DEFTS ORIG ANS FILED BY EILEEN M HOHLT Film code Number 785833960

Legacy Event

Legacy Event: Legacy events: DPLTAX; NON-SUITED OR DISMISSED BY TAX CASE GRANT FINAL NOTC OF NONSUIT Film code Number 787872538

Notice

Notice: NOTICE OF ORDER NONSUIT ORDER SIGNED 10292010 SHELDON ISD VS BI-WAY CONCR PUMPING I Film code Number 787872542

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: NOTICE OF ORDER NONSUIT ORDER SIGNED 10292010 SHELDON ISD VS BI-WAY CONCR PUMPING I Film code Number 787872542

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Legacy Event: Legacy events: DPLTAX; NON-SUITED OR DISMISSED BY TAX CASE GRANT FINAL NOTC OF NONSUIT Film code Number 787872538

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer: DEFTS ORIG ANS FILED BY EILEEN M HOHLT Film code Number 785833960

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: FOREGOING APPL FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF GRANTED Film code Number 781815638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED TAX CASE SHELDON INDEP SCHOOL DIST VS BI-WAY CONCRETE PUMPING INC ETAL Film code Number 779901070

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Cash Receipt: CR #666817 NO FEE PAID BY PERDUE BRANDON FIELDER SHELDON INDEPENDENT SCHO VS BI-WAY CONCRETE PUMPING TAX SUIT NO FEE DUE SEE SEC.33.34 OF PROPERTY CODE Film code Number 779901069

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: OF HEARING ON REQ INJUNCTIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO SECT 33.41D AND C TX PRO TAX CODE Film code Number 779952864

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABCO LEASING INC. is a litigant