This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/06/2022 at 18:04:07 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC VS TERESA D COLLINS

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TERESA D COLLINS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1784

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Second Round Sub, LLC

Defendant

Teresa D Collins

Katy, TX 77449

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olsen-Zhang, Jessica

Attorney at Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Enerson & Hornik LLC

15660 N Dallas Parkway #350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

RSIEH_4184291_LET_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

RSIEH_4184291_PET_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

4184291 AJ.pdf

Proposed Order: Agreed Judgment

Agreed Judgment- sent to Judge

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Lead_ProofofServiceorNonService_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service: Unserved

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang