This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/11/2022 at 18:17:22 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK (PALAIS ROYAL) VS LESBIA Y MENJIVAR

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK PALAIS ROYAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LESBIA Y MENJIVAR. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7415

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Second Round Sub, Llc Assignee Of Comenity Bank (palais Royal)

15660 Dallas Pkwy Ste 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant

Lesbia Y Menjivar

Houston, TX 77036-3838

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto, Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallace, Ryan Mackenzie

Attorney at Rausch Sturm LLP

15660 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

RSIEH_4022527_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

RSIEH_4022527_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

Answer

Answer

Lead_ProofofServiceorNonService_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dispute Resolution Center is a litigant

Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wallace, Ryan M