This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 14:32:02 (UTC).

SAUCHEEN FINANCING, LLC VS MONTOYA CONSTRUCTION INC,MARGARITA MONTOYA

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 SAUCHEEN FINANCING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONTOYA CONSTRUCTION INC,MARGARITA MONTOYA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5805

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAUCHEEN FINANCING, LLC

Defendants

MONTOYA CONSTRUCTION INC

3305 Camden St

Silver Spring, MD 20902

MARGARITA MONTOYA

Silver Spring, MD 20902

Garnishor

Saucheen Financing LLC

Garnishee

Bank of America NA

C/O Ct Corporation Systems, 1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

REGENT, ANH H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

Lawsuit - Montoya Construction Inc.pdf

eFile Original Petition

AJ - Sent to Judge

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment - signed - Montoya Construction Inc.pdf

Proposed Order: Agreed Judgment

Amended Lawsuit - Montoya Construction Inc.pdf

Amended Petition

Request for Exemplified Judgment- Montoya Construction.pdf

Request: Request for Exemplified Judgment

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Application for Garnishment-fee no mapping: 1st Garnishee, See -801

Letter

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Exemplification Certificate Section II

Exemplification Certificate Section: I & II

Exemplification Certificate Section I

Exemplification Certificate Section: I & II

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExemplification Certificate Section: I & II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Request for Exemplified Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment-fee no mapping: 1st Garnishee, See -801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAUCHEEN FINANCING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGENT, ANH H