This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/20/2022 at 23:40:05 (UTC).

SAUCHEEN FINANCING, LLC VS DALLAS LARSON,QUEST STAFFING SERVICES

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 SAUCHEEN FINANCING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DALLAS LARSON,QUEST STAFFING SERVICES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-802

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor

SAUCHEEN FINANCING, LLC

Defendants

QUEST STAFFING SERVICES

2262 W 5400 S

Taylorsville, UT 84129

DALLAS LARSON

Taylorsville, UT 84129

Garnishee

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

C/O Ct Corporation Systems1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

REGENT, ANH H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

Cover Letter for Applicatin for Writ of Garnishment - Chase Bank.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M\O ATTY

6033897-41192954-mtskrLrZSIhBa7o.pdf

Return of Service

Order of Dismissal (submitted)

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Proposed Order of Nonsuit Garnishment - Chase - Quest Staffing.pdf

Proposed Order

Notice of Nonsuit Garnishment - Chase - Quest Staffing.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M\O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment No-Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUEST STAFFING SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where SAUCHEEN FINANCING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGENT, ANH H