Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/06/2021 at 13:46:24 (UTC).

SAMUEL ONYEBUCHI VS NO NAME SHOWN

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 SAMUEL ONYEBUCHI filed an Other lawsuit against NO NAME SHOWN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4017

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Onyebuchi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Restrepo, Ruben Dario, Jr.

Attorney at Ruben Restrepo Law, PLLC

1001 Texas Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002-3194

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING HEARING SO.pdf

Notice of Hearing

Occupational Order CT 3

Proposed Order

ORDER SETTING HEARING.pdf

Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy of Occupational Driver's License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Occupational Drivers License

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Restrepo, Ruben Dario, Jr.