Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/09/2021 at 14:59:09 (UTC).

ROGELIO MORALES, JR. VS JESUS DUARTE CABRERA,JOSE CABRERA

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 ROGELIO MORALES, JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUS DUARTE CABRERA,JOSE CABRERA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5970

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rogelio Morales, Jr.

Defendants

Jose Cabrera

Houston, TX 77099

Jesus Duarte Cabrera

Houston, TX 77099

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRESUTTI, RICHARD J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES RICHARD J PRESUTTI

525 N Sam Houston Pkwy E #600

Houston, TX 77060

 

Court Documents

Notice of Automatic Stay

Notice: Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings

Answer

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

2021.03.542004.pdf

Return of Service

2021.03.542007.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Service Request.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dispute Resolution Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRESUTTI, RICHARD J.