This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 14:33:00 (UTC).

RODOLFO HERNANDEZ VS DAVID CARLISLE

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 RODOLFO HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID CARLISLE. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4321

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODOLFO HERNANDEZ

Defendant

DAVID CARLISLE

Houston, TX 77055

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FILIPOVITCH, STEPHEN

2009 Lubbock St

Houston, TX 77007-7621

 

Court Documents

plaintiff's original petition (44).pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Order granting motion to retain (3).pdf

Proposed Order: Granting Motion to Retain

Motion to Retain (3).pdf

Motion to Retain

Return of Serrvice.pdf

Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Retain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Granting Motion to Retain

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FILIPOVITCH STEPHEN