This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 18:14:53 (UTC).

ROBERT TURNER JOHNSTON VS SHIN AE KANG,HAI SUK SONG

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 ROBERT TURNER JOHNSTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHIN AE KANG,HAI SUK SONG. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7066

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Turner Johnston

Katy, TX 77493

Defendants

Shin Ae Kang

Ashburn, VA 20148

Hai Suk Song

Katy, TX 77449

Counter Defendant

Tomeka Richard

Counter Plaintiff

Lifetime Fitness, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

DENISE E HEWITT PETERSON

Houston, TX 77065

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Johnston, R Turner

3201 White Oak

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorneys

Deleeuw, Jane Ingrid

Attorney at LEVIN &CLINEBELL

50 Briar Hollow Ln., Ste 505W

Houston, TX 77027

Deleeuw, Jane

Attorney at Law Office of Clinebell, Yorra and Madariaga

50 Briar Hollow Ln., Ste 505W

Houston, TX 77027

Counter Plaintiff Attorney

CHEAIRS, MELANIE RAE

Attorney at LORANCE & THOMPSON, P.C.

2900 North Loop West Ste 500

Houston, TX 77092

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

EXECUTED Settlement Rule 11 - JOHNSTON, R.pdf

Rule 11 Agreement

Civil Case Information Sheet.pdf

eFile Original Petition

POP Exhibts.pdf

eFile Original Petition

POP.pdf

eFile Original Petition

citation request - Hai Suk Song.pdf

Rule 106 Citation to be Issued

citation request - Shin Ae Kang.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: PER REQUEST LETTER - M/O ATTY R. TURNER JOHNSTON

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: PER REQUEST LETTER - M/O ATTY R. TURNER JOHNSTON

Original Petition Non Resident Citation

Original Petition Citation Non-Resident Defendant Issued: PER REQUEST LETTER - M/O ATTY R. TURNER JOHNSTON

Original Petition Non Resident Citation

Original Petition Citation Non-Resident Defendant Issued: PER REQUEST LETTER - M/O ATTY R. TURNER JOHNSTON

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories: Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: DEFEDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: PER REQUEST LETTER - M/O ATTY R. TURNER JOHNSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Non-Resident Defendant Issued: PER REQUEST LETTER - M/O ATTY R. TURNER JOHNSTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 106 Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifetime Fitness Inc. d/b/a Life Time Fitness is a litigant