Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/07/2017 at 11:35:09 (UTC).

ROBERT HOLMES VS. GEORGES ELEC SERV ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2009 ROBERT HOLMES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GEORGES ELEC SERV. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******-002

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Cross Plaintiff

ROBERT HOLMES

Cross Defendants

CONST GUZMAN

PINE VIL NO ASSN

STATES AMER UNITED

TED L WALKER

CASSEL CRAIG

STERLING BANK

METRO FUNDING CORP

JAMES OCONNER

LASHAWNDA WRIGHT

GEORGE TIDDEN

GEORGES ELEC SERV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPBELL, JOHN H.

2200 Market St #804

Galveston, TX 77550

Cross Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS JR, HERBERT CLIFTON

Attorney at ROBERTS MARKEL WEINBERG BUTLER

2800 Post Oak Blvd Ste 5777

Houston, TX 77056

CERSONSKY, M H

Attorney at CERSONSKY ROSEN & GARCIA PC

1770 St James Place Suite 150

Houston, TX 77056

WYLIE, MATTHEW G.

2910 Houston Ave

Houston, TX 77009

FRENCH , W C

8744 Wilcrest Dr

Houston, TX 77099

 

Court Documents

Cross Claim

Cross Claim: CROSS CLAIM FILED BY ROBERT HOLMES Film code Number 776826324

Cash Receipt

Cash Receipt: CR #651209 AMT $40.00 PAID BY JOHN H CAMPBELL METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHC VS CASSEL CRAIG ETAL CROSS CLAIM Film code Number 776826323

Legacy Event

Legacy Event: Legacy events: MOT&ORD JOINT MOT TO DISMISS GRANTED Film code Number 785823691

Legacy Event

Legacy Event: Legacy events: MOT&ORD AGREED JUDG DISMISSING CLMS OF GEORGE TIDDEN GRANT Film code Number 785814337

Legacy Event

Legacy Event: Legacy events: MOT&ORD AGREED JUDG DISMISSING CLMS OF UNITED STATES OF AMER GRANT Film code Number 785814320

Notice

Notice: NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSAL ORDER SIGNED 08242010 METROPOLITAN TRANSIT A VS CASSEL CRAIG ETAL Film code Number 785814277

Notice

Notice: NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSAL ORDER IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF SIGNED 08192010 HOLMES ROBERT VS CASSEL CRAIG ETAL Film code Number 785823695

Judgment

Judgment: JUDGMENT NOT SIGNED AGREED DJUDG DISMISSING GREG ABBOTT OFC OF ATTY GENERAL Film code Number 785835420

Agreed Judgment

Agreed Judgment: DISMISSING GRANTED Film code Number 785913481

Crt 4-Hearing Notice

Crt 4-Hearing Notice

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Order Returned

Order Returned: UNCLAIMED FOR TRIAL SETTING Film code number CCCL-2014-269467

Amended Answer

Amended Answer: CASSEL'S FOURT AMENDED ANSWER TO HOLMES'S CROSS-CLAIM Film code number CCCL-2014-364848

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Answer: CASSEL'S FOURT AMENDED ANSWER TO HOLMES'S CROSS-CLAIM Film code number CCCL-2014-364848

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: FOURTH AMENDED ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Returned: UNCLAIMED FOR TRIAL SETTING Film code number CCCL-2014-269467

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 4-Hearing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • Vacated Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: STATUS CONVERENCE AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS Film code number CCCL-2014-20731

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 4-Status Conference and Notice of Intent to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Agreed Judgment: DISMISSING GRANTED Film code Number 785913481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment: JUDGMENT NOT SIGNED AGREED DJUDG DISMISSING GREG ABBOTT OFC OF ATTY GENERAL Film code Number 785835420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSAL ORDER IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF SIGNED 08192010 HOLMES ROBERT VS CASSEL CRAIG ETAL Film code Number 785823695

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSAL ORDER SIGNED 08242010 METROPOLITAN TRANSIT A VS CASSEL CRAIG ETAL Film code Number 785814277

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Legacy Event: Legacy events: MOT&ORD AGREED JUDG DISMISSING CLMS OF UNITED STATES OF AMER GRANT Film code Number 785814320

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Legacy Event: Legacy events: MOT&ORD AGREED JUDG DISMISSING CLMS OF GEORGE TIDDEN GRANT Film code Number 785814337

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Legacy Event: Legacy events: MOT&ORD JOINT MOT TO DISMISS GRANTED Film code Number 785823691

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Cash Receipt: CR #651209 AMT $40.00 PAID BY JOHN H CAMPBELL METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHC VS CASSEL CRAIG ETAL CROSS CLAIM Film code Number 776826323

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross Claim: CROSS CLAIM FILED BY ROBERT HOLMES Film code Number 776826324

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • Original Petition (SUB)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sterling Bank and Trust FSB is a litigant