Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/30/2021 at 13:45:15 (UTC).

RICOH USA INC. VS SPECTRACELL LABORATORIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 RICOH USA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SPECTRACELL LABORATORIES, INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8274

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICOH USA INC.

Defendant

SPECTRACELL LABORATORIES, INC.

1999 Bryan St Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court

JOSE LOPEZ, II

Houston, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOTZ, JON D

Attorney at TOTZ ELLISON & TOTZ PC

2211 Norfolk, Suite #510

Houston, TX 77098

ELLISON, MARC L

Attorney at TOTZ ELLISON & TOTZ PC

2211 Norfolk Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

Gargano, Brian

11200 Westheimer, Ste 120

Houston, TX 77042

 

Court Documents

101054 Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Order Granting Joint Motion for Continuance.pdf

Motion for Continuance: Joint Motion w/proposed order

Joint Motion for Continuance.pdf

Motion for Continuance: Joint Motion w/proposed order

Rule 11 Agreement.pdf

Letter: Rule 11 Agreement

101054-designations_cover.pdf

Letter: Cover Letter

101054-designations_atty.pdf

Designation of Attorney

101054-designations_wit.pdf

Designation: of Witness

101054-certificate.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery

2020.10.05 Machemer Affidavit Final.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer, Verified Denial, Affirmative Defenses and Requests for Disclosure

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Machemer Affidavit_000042.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer, Verified Denial, Affirmative Defenses, and Rule 194 Requests for Disclosure

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

101054 Case Info Sheet.pdf

Civil Case Information Sheet

101054 Clerk letter.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuance: Joint Motion w/proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Rule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation: of Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer, Verified Denial, Affirmative Defenses, and Rule 194 Requests for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer, Verified Denial, Affirmative Defenses and Requests for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICOH USA INC is a litigant