This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 00:40:04 (UTC).

RESURGENCE FINL LLC VS THOMAS CLARA M

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 RESURGENCE FINL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THOMAS CLARA M. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******-801

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESURGENCE FINL LLC

4100 Commercial Ave

Northbrook, IL 60062

Defendant

THOMAS CLARA M

Garnishor

OLD WEST CAPITAL CO.

Garnishee

FIRST CONVENIENCE BANK

C/O James W. Meredith, Registered Agent, 507 N. Gray

Killeen, TX 76541

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hull, James N

Attorney at COUCH, CONVILLE & BLITT, LLC

6200 Savoy, Suite 440

Houston, TX 77036

Garnishor Attorney

RICHMAN, ALISA S.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALISA RICHMAN

304 S. Record St Ste 100

Dallas, TX 75202

Garnishee Attorney

Kinslow, Samuel T

P.O. Box 21473

Waco, TX 76702

 

Court Documents

Clara Thomas Garn Civil Process Form.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

Affidavit of Notice to Defendant Per 663a TRCP

Affidavit: of Notice ot Defendant Per 663a TRCP

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

thomas-ans.pdf

Answer: answer of garnishee

Answer

Answer

Nonsuit sent to Judge

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Thomas, Garn Nonsuit Order.pdf

Proposed Order: of Non-Suit

Thomas - GarnNonsuit .pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: answer of garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: of Notice ot Defendant Per 663a TRCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment No-Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST CONVENIENCE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Old West Capital Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where RESURGENCE FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel T Kinslow