This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 15:34:13 (UTC).

RESERVE AT 63 SIXTY THREE APARTMENTS VS TAURUS JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 RESERVE AT 63 SIXTY THREE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TAURUS JOHNSON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6548

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reserve at 63 Sixty Three Apartments

C/O Angelya Parker 6363 West Airport Blvd

Houston, TX 77035

Defendant

Taurus Johnson

Houston, TX 77035

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hansen, Robert L

Attorney at Hoover Slovacek LLP Galleria Tower II

5051 Westheimer Suite 1200

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice- Taurus.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

Order to Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice- Taurus.pdf

Proposed Order: Order

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: NON-SUITED / DISMISSED BY PALINTIFF NOTICE OF ORDER

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY TAURUS JOHNSON

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

JP Notice of Hearing

JP Notice of Hearing: #1

JP Notice of Hearing

JP Notice of Hearing: #2

JP Notice of Hearing

JP Notice of Hearing: #2

JP Order

JP Order: GENERAL OF THE COURT

Request

Request: FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

JP Notice

JP Notice: WRIT OF POSSESSION

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Notice

JP Notice: BILL OF COSTS

JP Index

JP Index

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: NON-SUITED / DISMISSED BY PALINTIFF NOTICE OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY TAURUS JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Hearing: #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Hearing: #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Hearing: #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Hearing: #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Order: GENERAL OF THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: BILL OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less