This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 12:09:51 (UTC).

RENE CRUZ VS SPIKE CONSTRUCTION, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 RENE CRUZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SPIKE CONSTRUCTION, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7876

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENE CRUZ

Defendant

SPIKE CONSTRUCTION, LLC

C/O Joseph Romero, Registered Agent 112 West Avenue B

Robstown, TX 78380

Not Classified By Court

John Odam

Houston, TX 77027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOTZ, JON D

Attorney at TOTZ ELLISON & TOTZ PC

2211 Norfolk, Suite #510

Houston, TX 77098

ELLISON, MARC L

Attorney at TOTZ ELLISON & TOTZ PC

2211 Norfolk Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

WARREN , JOHN S

606 N Carancahua St Suite 601

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorney

Rodriguez, David

8000Ih-10 West Ste 1500

San Antonio, TX 78230

 

Court Documents

Motion To Substitute Counsel .pdf

Motion to Substitute Counsel

Order.pdf

Proposed Order: Proposed Order to Substitute Counsel

Order.pdf

Order to Substitute Counsel

Certificate of Transfer Returned

Certificate of Transfer Returned

Certificate of Transfer

Certificate of Transfer Issued

mcervante-court-100697-20200506-105456.pdf

Certificate of Transfer To be Issued: Request for Certified Copy of Order Granting Transfer

Motion to Transfer.pdf

Motion to Transfer Venue: NOT SET

20200301_RENE CRUZ DBA RMC STUCCO SUPPLY, PLAINTIFF.pdf

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Return of Service

Return of Service

Order to Transfer.pdf

Proposed Order: Agreed Order to Transfer

Rule 11 Agreement.pdf

Rule 11 Agreement

Order to Transfer.pdf

Order to Transfer Venue: agreed

100697 Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

100697 County Civil Info Sheet.pdf

Civil Case Information Sheet

100697 Clerk letter.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: HOLD FOR LOOP LEGAL

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Substitute Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Substitute Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order to Substitute Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Transfer Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Transfer Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Transfer To be Issued: Request for Certified Copy of Order Granting Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Transfer Venue: agreed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Order to Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation: of Witness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Transfer Venue: NOT SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: HOLD FOR LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPIKE CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLISON, MARC L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTZ, JON D