This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/23/2022 at 10:07:01 (UTC).

RENAISSANCE IMPORTS, INC.,PRIMUS PROPERTIES, LLC VS CHARLES CALISH,GOODBUYS USA, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 RENAISSANCE IMPORTS, INC ,PRIMUS PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLES CALISH,GOODBUYS USA, INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6006

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Renaissance Imports, Inc.

Primus Properties, LLC

Defendants

Charles Calish

Houston, TX 77036

Goodbuys USA, Inc.

C/O Charles Calish, 8728 Glenmont

Houston, TX 77036

Not Classified By Court

JASON H.G. TRUITT

Houston, TX 77069

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pennell, Kevin R

Attorney at Pennell Law Firm PLLC

19 Briar Hollow Lane, Suite 110

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorney

Deyon, Derek H

Attorney at The Deyon Law Group, PLLC

440 Louisiana St., Ste. 900

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Req_Abst of Judg - Renaissance_GoodBuys.pdf

Abstract of Judgment to be Issued: for GoodBuys

order.signed (Primus).pdf

Abstract of Judgment to be Issued: for Charles Calish

Req_Abst of Judg - Primus_Calish.pdf

Abstract of Judgment to be Issued: for Charles Calish

order.signed (Primus).pdf

Abstract of Judgment to be Issued: for GoodBuys

Req_Abst of Judg - Primus_GoodBuys.pdf

Abstract of Judgment to be Issued: for GoodBuys

Abstract

Abstract Issued: Defendant: Charles Calish

Abstract

Abstract Issued: Defendant: GoodBuys USA, Inc.

Abstract

Abstract Issued: Defendant: Charles Calish

Abstract

Abstract Issued: Defendant: GoodBuys USA, Inc.

Harris Co civil court service req.Calish.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: See Request

Harris Co civil court service req.Goodbuys.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: See Request

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Exh A

eFile Original Petition

Exh 1

eFile Original Petition

Exh 2

eFile Original Petition

Exh B

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract Issued: Defendant: GoodBuys USA, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract Issued: Defendant: Charles Calish

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract Issued: Defendant: GoodBuys USA, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract Issued: Defendant: Charles Calish

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment to be Issued: for GoodBuys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment to be Issued: for Charles Calish

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment to be Issued: for GoodBuys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment from Party: for Charles Calish

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummary Judgment and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment: Primus Properties, LLC's Motion for Traditiional Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendants' Original Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: See Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: See Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Goodbuys USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deyon, Derek H