This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/19/2020 at 15:35:57 (UTC).

REGIS CAPITAL GROUP VS VANN HEFLIN HOLDINGS INC,INNOVATIVE BUSINESS MANAGEMENT,OPEN HEART RECOVERY INC,WINMEDIA SOLUTIONS LLC,NATIONAL REAL ESTATE LOGISTICS SERVICES LLC,PROMENADE QUICK STOP,INNOVATIVE BSNSS. MGT. AND DEV. LLC,TOTAL CONTROL TALENT AC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 REGIS CAPITAL GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VANN HEFLIN HOLDINGS INC,INNOVATIVE BUSINESS MANAGEMENT,OPEN HEART RECOVERY INC,WINMEDIA SOLUTIONS LLC,NATIONAL REAL ESTATE LOGISTICS SERVICES LLC,PROMENADE QUICK STOP,INNOVATIVE BSNSS MGT AND DEV LLC,TOTAL CONTROL TALENT AC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6541

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor

Regis Capital Group

Defendants

Stephen Vann Heflin

Los Angeles, CA 90011

Innovative Business Management

133 The Promenade Suite 102

Long Beach, CA 90802

Winmedia Solutions LLC

18653 Ventura Blvd Suite 561

Tarzana, CA 91356

Innovative BSNSS. MGT. AND DEV. LLC

133 The Promenade Suite 102

Long Beach, CA 90802

Vann Heflin Holdings Inc

3320 S Central

Los Angeles, CA 90011

Promenade Quick Stop

Los Angeles, CA 90011

Total Control Talent Academy of Performing Arts

3320 S Central

Los Angeles, CA 90011

Open Heart Recovery Inc

18653 Ventura Blvd Suite 561

Tarzana, CA 91356

National Real Estate Logistics Services LLC

18653 Ventura Blvd Suite 561

Tarzana, CA 91356

Garnishee

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

C/O Ct Corporation Systems 1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

REGENT, ANH H

3601 Audubon

Houston, TX 77006

Garnishee Attorney

Spring, Truman E

Attorney at Spring Law Firm

1101 Ridge Road, Suite 205

Rockwell, TX 75087

 

Court Documents

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

Non-Suit Garnishment - Chase - Van Heflin.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT AND MOTION TO DISMISS

Order Granting Nonsuit - Chase - Van Heflin.pdf

Proposed Order: Order Granting Non-Suit

Order Granting Nonsuit - Chase - Van Heflin.pdf

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Cover letter for Writ of Garnishment - Chase.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Application for Writ of Garnishment - Chase - Vann Heflin.pdf

Application for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

Rule 11 Agreement.pdf

Rule 11 Agreement

Rule 11 Agreement - Chase - revised _Vann Heflin (1).pdf

Rule 11 Agreement

5547624-36853429-kCf7rWxSFYpvnd3.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

COAL-24Jan20-3702.pdf

Answer

Notice of Garnishment - service copy - Chase.pdf

Notice: Notice of Garnishment

Cover letter for Writ of Garnishment - Chase.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Application for Writ of Garnishment - signed - Chase.pdf

Application for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: HOLD FOR ATTY

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NON-SUIT AND MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Granting Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Notice of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: HOLD FOR ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less