This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/14/2022 at 14:36:46 (UTC).

REGION CAPITAL VS MELISA MARIE TROTT,MELISA MARIE TROTT

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 REGION CAPITAL filed an Other lawsuit against MELISA MARIE TROTT,MELISA MARIE TROTT. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-801

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Garnishor and Plaintiff

Region Capital

Defendant

Melisa Marie Trott

Garnishee

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

C/O Ct Corporation Systems1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Garnishor and Plaintiff Attorney

Regent, Anh H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

Cover Letter for Writ of Garnishment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Original Petition (OCA)

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued

6068546-41494941-5CePrjQCnfwuNHx.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

Garnishment Order of Dismissal - to Judge.pdf

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Order of Dismissal - Chase Bank.pdf

Proposed Order

Notice of Non-Suit Garnishment - Chase Bank.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: of Garnishment

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment No-Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGION CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGENT, ANH H