This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/21/2022 at 14:55:21 (UTC).

REGION CAPITAL VS DANIEL E THOMAS,TRUE COMMERCIAL SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 REGION CAPITAL filed an Other lawsuit against DANIEL E THOMAS,TRUE COMMERCIAL SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-801

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor

Region Capital

Defendants

True Commercial Services, LLC

3240 Elkcam Blvd

Deltona, FL 32738

Daniel E Thomas

Deltona, FL 32738

Garnishee

REGIONS BANK, N.A.

C/O Corporation Service Company211 East 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

Regent, Anh H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

Cover Letter for Writ of Garnishment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Original Petition (OCA)

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued

Answer

Answer

6068547-41491496-XC2RMAOSsRovyDF.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

Nonsuit sent to Judge

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Proposed Order of Nonsuit Garnishment - Regions - True Commercial Services.pdf

Proposed Order: of Nonsuit Garnishment - Regions - True Commercial Services

Notice of Nonsuit Garnishment - Regions - True Commercial Services.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Notice of Nonsuit Garnishment - Regions - True Commercial Services

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Notice of Nonsuit Garnishment - Regions - True Commercial Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: of Nonsuit Garnishment - Regions - True Commercial Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment No-Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where REGION CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGENT, ANH H