This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/04/2017 at 07:28:22 (UTC).

REGAL FOOD SERV INC VS. GET-N-GO*DBA* ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/14/2001 REGAL FOOD SERV INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GET-N-GO DBA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **2184

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGAL FOOD SERV INC

Defendants

J & E OIL INC ETAL

804 Pecan #1

Mcallen, TX 78501

GET-N-GO*DBA*

Mcallen, TX 78501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adams, Cynthia J

3405 Marquart

Houston, TX 77027

Defendant Attorney

STOUWIE , KEVIN WAYNE

Suite 201 9514 Console Drive

San Antonio, TX 78229

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2002
  • Dismissal: DISMISSAL GRANTED REGAL FOOD SERV INC VS J & E OIL INC ETAL Film code Number 742765453

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2002
  • Order: ORDER FOR TRIAL SETTING REGAL FOOD SERV INC VS J & E OIL INC ETAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE DATE:10112002 TRIAL DATE WEEK BEGINNING 10142002 TRIAL TIME 09:00 A.M. Film code Number 739683205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2002
  • Status Conference: STATUS CONFERENCE ANNOUNCEMENT - REGAL FOOD SERV INC VS J & E OIL ETAL Film code Number 739683192

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2002
  • Order: STATUS CONFERENCE REGAL FOOD SERV INC VS J & E OIL INC ETAL STATUS CONF SET FOR 03202002 CONFERENCE TIME 08:00 A.M. Film code Number 737743158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2002
  • Answer: DEFT ORIG ANS FILED BY KEVIN W STOUWIE- REGAL FOOD SERV INC VS J & E OIL INC ETAL Film code Number 737680279

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2001
  • Citation Returned: - REGAL FOOD SERV INC VS J & E OIL INC ETAL DEFECTIVE Film code Number 737621408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2001
  • Citation Issued: REGAL FOOD SERV INC VS J & E OIL INC ETAL Film code Number 736680470

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2001
  • Contract: ORIGINAL PETITION FILED BY PLTF -REGAL FOOD SERV INC VS J & E OIL INC ETAL Film code Number 736666329

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2001
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2001
  • Cash Receipt: CR #295764 AMT $140.00 PAID BY CYNTHIA LEA JONES REGAL FOOD SVC INC VS J & E OIL INC ETAL PET.FILED01 CIT.(S)TO BE ISSUED HOLD FOR PICK UP Film code Number 736666328

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOUWIE KEVIN WAYNE