Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/21/2021 at 13:01:44 (UTC).

RCP TUNNEL, LLC,R & A ROAD BORING LLC VS MMG CONTRACTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 RCP TUNNEL, LLC,R A ROAD BORING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MMG CONTRACTORS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9469

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

RCP Tunnel, LLC

R & A Road Boring LLC

RCP Tunnel LLC

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

MMG Contractors LLC

C/O George Morales 1900 Charles Road

Houston, TX 77093

Not Classified By Court

DWIGHT E JEFFERSON

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gould, Eric

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ERIC GOULD

5773 Woodway Suite 184

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

NORRIS, DEBRA

P.O. Box 8039

Houston, TX 77288

 

Court Documents

JOINT NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

Motion for Non-Suit

ORDER GRANTING JOINT NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

Motion for Non-Suit

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non Suit- Sent to Judge

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIM

Counter Claim: and Response to Motion For Summary Judgment

Exhibit 1

Counter Claim: and Response to Motion For Summary Judgment

Prayer for Relief

Letter

Exhibit 2

Letter

Exhibit 1

Letter

DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ORIGINAL COUNTERCLAIM

Response: to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

Exhibit 1

Response: to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

GGR - MMG MSJ.pdf

Motion for Summary Judgment

GGR - MMG Atty Fee Aff to Ct.pdf

Motion for Summary Judgment

GGR - MMG N of Subm.pdf

Notice of Submission

GGR - MMG Final Judg.pdf

Proposed Order

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Jury Fee

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounter Claim: and Response to Motion For Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: service by Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RCP Tunnel, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MMG Contractors LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gould, Eric