Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 06:13:27 (UTC).

RAY SOSTAK ET AL. VS. CITY OF HOUSTON TEXAS

Case Summary

On 02/17/2014 RAY SOSTAK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CITY OF HOUSTON TEXAS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3863

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOSTAK RAY

SOSTAK KATHY

POWELL KATHLEEN

BRIE KELMAN

KATHLEEN POWELL

Houston, TX 77008

RAY SOSTAK

Houston, TX 77008

KATHY SOSTAK

Houston, TX 77008

PAUL LUCCIA

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant

CITY OF HOUSTON TEXAS

Houston, TX 77002

Not Classified By Court

ADELE O HEDGES

Houston, TX 77098

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SAULSBERRY DERRICK M

5023 Washington Avenue Suite 200

Houston, TX 77007

OWEN, ROBERT TRESCH

808 Travis, 20Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

AMIS, BRIAN

Attorney at ASSISTANT CITY ATTORNEY

P.O. Box 368

Houston, TX 77001-0368

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

NOTICE of Oral Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Traditional

Notice of Hearing

Amended Notice of Oral Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Tra

Amended Notice of Hearing

Amended Notice of Hearing

Amended Notice of Hearing

Order on Plaintiffs' Paul Luccia and Kathleen Powell's First

Amended Motion: for Traditional Summary Judgment

Plaintiffs' Paul Luccia and Kathleen Powell's First Amended

Amended Motion: for Traditional Summary Judgment

Notice of Oral Hearing on 1st Amended Motion for Summary Jud

Notice of Hearing

Order

Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

Exhibit D

Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

Exhibit C

Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

Exhibit B

Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

Exhibit A-3

Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

Exhibit A-2

Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

Exhibit A-1

Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

Exhibit A

Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended

Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

Reply in support Amended MSJ.pdf

Reply: in Support of First Amended Motion for Summary Judgment

Plaintiffs' Reply to City's Response to Plaintiffs' First Am

Reply: Plaintiffs' Luccia and Powell's Reply to City's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

139 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply: Plaintiffs' Luccia and Powell's Reply to City's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply: in Support of First Amended Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Response: The City of Houston's Response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Motion for Traditional Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Motion: for Traditional Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order: Agreed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
177 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIS, BRIAN