This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/22/2022 at 16:12:15 (UTC).

RAINBOW ADVANCE, LLC VS CURTIS DALE HERSEY,MOVE IT ALL LLC,MOVE4ALL INC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 RAINBOW ADVANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CURTIS DALE HERSEY,MOVE IT ALL LLC,MOVE4ALL INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-801

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAINBOW ADVANCE, LLC

Defendants

MOVE4ALL INC

40 N Alder Dr

Orlando, FL 32807

MOVE IT ALL LLC

40 N Alder Dr

Orlando, FL 32807

CURTIS DALE HERSEY

Orlando, FL 32807

Garnishor

Rainbow Advance LLC

Garnishee

JPMorgan Chase Bank NA

C/O Ct Corporation System, 1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

Regent, Anh H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

Letter

Letter

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

6209923 AFF.pdf

Return of Service

Nonsuit sent to Judge

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

order of dismissal - chase.pdf

Proposed Order

order of dismissal - chase.pdf

Proposed Order

notice of non suit - chase.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: garnishment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment No-Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOVE4ALL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Rainbow Advance, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGENT, ANH H