This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/26/2021 at 10:08:23 (UTC).

PRIORITY POSTAL CREDIT UNION VS JAHRED HARRIS

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 PRIORITY POSTAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JAHRED HARRIS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3003

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIORITY POSTAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

JAHRED HARRIS

Houston, TX 77095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR, JOHNNY

22503 Katy Freeway

Katy, TX 77450

 

Court Documents

letter to clerk to issue and serve alias citation.pdf

Alias Citation to be Issued

Alias Citation

Alias Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: UNSERVED

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: Unserved

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

ORIGINAL PETITION and request for disclosure.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued w/Constable Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued w/Constable Service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIORITY POSTAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant