This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/17/2021 at 15:11:31 (UTC).

PRIORITY POSTAL CREDIT UNION VS FREDRICK LOVELADY

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 PRIORITY POSTAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FREDRICK LOVELADY. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGE BARNSTONE and AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5345

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

GEORGE BARNSTONE

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIORITY POSTAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

FREDRICK LOVELADY

Houston, TX 77016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR, JOHNNY

22503 Katy Freeway

Katy, TX 77450

 

Court Documents

letter to clerk to issue abstract of judgment.pdf

Abstract of Judgment to be Issued: request to issue abstract of judgment

Abstract

Abstract Issued

final default judgment.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

motion for default judgment.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

DJ- Held

Default Judgment and Notice

Return of Service

Return of Service

ORIGINAL PETITION and request for disclosure.pdf

eFile Original Petition: & Citation to be Issued

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment to be Issued: request to issue abstract of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: & Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIORITY POSTAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant