This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 10/19/2021 at 15:01:28 (UTC).

PPG VS RELIABLE COATINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 PPG filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RELIABLE COATINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8967

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PPG

Defendant

RELIABLE COATINGS, LLC

C/O Registered Agents Inc. 5900 Balcones Drive, Ste 100

Austin, TX 78731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANZIANI, JOSE JAVIER

Attorney at FREEDMAN & PRICE PC

1102 West Ave, Suite 200

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

16746writ.pdf

Writ of Execution to be Issued

Writ of Execution

Execution Issued: 701

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT

Execution Returned

Execution Returned: Unexecuted

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

DJ - to Judge.pdf

Default Judgment and Notice

Reliable Coatings - Motion for DJ.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment: Holding until 7/6

Reliable Coatings - DJ.pdf

Proposed Order

Reliable Coatings LLC - Executed Citation.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

PETITION

eFile Original Petition

Request for Citation

Citation to Be Issued

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExecution Returned: Unexecuted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: DEFAULT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExecution Issued: 701

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment: Holding until 7/6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PPG Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where RELIABLE COATINGS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANZIANI, JOSE JAVIER