Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/07/2021 at 15:21:44 (UTC).

PORT TERMINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS JANET HANSON

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 PORT TERMINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JANET HANSON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4013

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORT TERMINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

JANET HANSON

Friendswood, TX 77546

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR, JOHNNY

22503 Katy Freeway

Katy, TX 77450

 

Court Documents

abstract of judgment to be issued

Abstract of Judgment to be Issued

Abstract

Abstract Issued

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Possession on Personal Property

Writ of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE TRAY

final judgment - entered.pdf

Request: Request to issue and serve writ of possession **NEED REQUEST LETTER WITH SERVICE ADDRESS**

letter to clerk with service address for writ.pdf

Writ of Possession to be Issued: previously paid for issuance on 3-29-21

final default judgment.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment: w/proposed order

motion for default judgment.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment: w/proposed order

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

NOTICE-DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Default Judgment and Notice

DJ - to judge.pdf

Default Judgment and Notice

Return of Service

Return of Service: Served

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

ORIGINAL PETITION and request for disclosure.pdf

eFile Original Petition: & Citation to be Issued

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE TRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Request to issue and serve writ of possession **NEED REQUEST LETTER WITH SERVICE ADDRESS**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued: previously paid for issuance on 3-29-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment: w/proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: & Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT TERMINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR, JOHNNY