This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/04/2021 at 13:43:23 (UTC).

PORT TERMINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS GLENDA DOYLE

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 PORT TERMINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GLENDA DOYLE. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2758

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORT TERMINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

GLENDA DOYLE

Houston, TX 77016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR, JOHNNY

22503 Katy Freeway

Katy, TX 77450

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer

final summary judgment.pdf

Motion for Summary Judgment: w/proposed order

motion for summary judgment.pdf

Motion for Summary Judgment: w/proposed order

notice of hearing.pdf

Notice of Hearing

Return of Service

Return of Service: Served

ORIGINAL PETITION and request for disclosure.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued-Constable Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment: w/proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Disclosures Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued-Constable Service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT TERMINAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR, JOHNNY