Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 12:37:43 (UTC).

PERFORMANCE WELLHEAD AND FRAC, LLC VS STRATEGY OPERATING, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 PERFORMANCE WELLHEAD AND FRAC, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STRATEGY OPERATING, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6149

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Performance Wellhead and Frac, LLC

Defendants

Strategy Operating, Inc.

C/O Ryan Roberts 210 N. Main Street

Midland, TX 79701-5240

Strategy Operating, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Edward J Wallison, Jr.

The Woodlands, TX 77380

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TREU, STEVEN B

Attorney at JEFFERS BROOK KREAGER & GRAGG

745 E Mulberry 9Th Floor

San Antonio, TX 78212

Defendant Attorney

SHIELDS , ROBERT BRIAN

Attorney at SHIELDS LEGAL GROUP, P.C.

16301 Quorum Drive, Suite 250B

Addison, TX 75001

 

Court Documents

Agreed Final Judgment .pdf

Proposed Order: Proposed Judgment

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

NOTICE AGREED JUDGMENT

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment (submitted)

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Motion for Summary Judgment.pdf

Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Submission .pdf

Notice of Submission

Motion to Enter Default Judgment .pdf

Motion for Default Judgment: Motion to Enter Default Judgment

Notice of Incomplete Default

Notice: of Incomplete Default

Plaintiff's First Amended Petition.pdf

Amended Petition

Request for Process (Harris CountyAmended Pet).pdf

Amended Citation to be Issued

Amended Petition Citation

Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

2020001905.pdf

Return of Service

Original Answer-GD.pdf

Answer: Defendant, Strategy Operating, LLC's Original Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant, Strategy Operating, LLC's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Incomplete Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment: Motion to Enter Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: m/o atty

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Strategy Operating, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Performance Wellhead and Frac, LLC is a litigant