This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/18/2020 at 10:25:43 (UTC).

PEDRO CISNEROS VS WARREN O. HUNT,LEATHA L. JONES

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 PEDRO CISNEROS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WARREN O HUNT,LEATHA L JONES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6607

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pedro Cisneros

Defendants

Warren O. Hunt

Houston, TX 77046-0890

Leatha L. Jones

Houston, TN 77046-0890

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lopez, Jose R, II

4601 Washington Avenue Suite 200

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant Attorney

PETERSON, DENISE E HEWITT

Attorney at THE LAW FIRM OF DENISE EREKA PETERSON

9597 Jones Road #350

Houston, TX 77065

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing Medical and Billing Records.pdf

Business Records Affidavit: Notice of Filing Medical and Billing Records

Medicorp Management- Affidavit & Billing.pdf

Affidavit: Medicorp Management Affidavit and Billing

Medicorp Management -Affidavit & Medical.pdf

Affidavit: Medicorp Management- Affidavit & Medical

Motion to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem.pdf

Motion to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

Publisher's Affidavit - Warren O. Hunt.pdf

Affidavit: Publisher's Affidavit for Warren O. Leatha L. Jones

Publisher's Affidavit - Leatha L. Jones.pdf

Affidavit: Publisher's Affidavit for Warren O. Hunt

Order to Appoint Attorney Ad litem.pdf

Proposed Order: Proposed Order to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

Order to Appoint Attorney Ad litem-SUB 6-26-20.pdf

Order to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem: for Defendants

Order to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

Order to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem: for Defendants

Motion for Service Pursuant to Rule 109.pdf

Motion: Motion for Service Pursuant to Rule 109

Order for Service by Publication.pdf

Proposed Order: Order for Service by Publication

Brief for publication- Leatha L. Jones.pdf

Brief: Brief for Publication - Leatha L. Jones

Brief for Publication- Warren Hunt.pdf

Brief: Brief for Publication- Warren Hunt (Warron Hunt)

Rule 109 Affidavit.pdf

Affidavit: Rule 109 Affidavit

Civil Process Request.pdf

Citation by Publication to be Issued

Plaintiffs Original Petition with Request for Disclosure.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition with Request for Disclosure

Civil Case Information Sheet.pdf

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Process Request.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBusiness Records Affidavit: Notice of Filing Medical and Billing Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: Medicorp Management Affidavit and Billing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: Medicorp Management- Affidavit & Medical

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem: for Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: Publisher's Affidavit for Warren O. Leatha L. Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: Publisher's Affidavit for Warren O. Hunt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order to Appoint Attorney Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Letter from Jose R. Lopez, II

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: Motion for Service Pursuant to Rule 109

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order for Service by Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief: Brief for Publication - Leatha L. Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief: Brief for Publication- Warren Hunt (Warron Hunt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: Rule 109 Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation by Publication to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition with Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: ***NEED A BRIEF AND AFFIDAVIT FOR PUBLICATION SERVICE***

    Read MoreRead Less