This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/30/2021 at 16:04:34 (UTC).

PARK 45 VS DAYQUEN GRANT

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 PARK 45 filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DAYQUEN GRANT. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7109

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Park 45

C/O Luis Velazquez 20330 Whitewood Dr.

Spring, TX 77373

Defendant

Dayquen Grant

Spring, TX 77373

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Writ of Possession on Property (Court Judgment)

Writ of Possession on Person Property Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

Proposed Order

Proposed Order

Plaintiff's Order to Withdraw Funds - to Judge

Order to Withdraw Funds

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

JP Notice of Trial Setting

JP Notice of Trial Setting: VIRTUAL

JP Notice of Trial Setting

JP Notice of Trial Setting: RESET

JP Notice of Trial Setting

JP Notice of Trial Setting: VIRTUAL

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession on Person Property Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits: 4201 DAYQUEN GRANT LEASE PACKET-FILED IN COURT NJ 5/4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: JP DEPOSIT $1,380.00 204100314168 RECEIPT # 00363726

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting: VIRTUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting: VIRTUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Park 45 is a litigant