This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 23:19:15 (UTC).

PABLO GONZALES VS JOSE FRANCISCO VARGAS-ARGUELLES

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 PABLO GONZALES filed an Other lawsuit against JOSE FRANCISCO VARGAS-ARGUELLES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7606

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pablo Gonzales

Defendant

Jose Francisco Vargas-Arguelles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walls, William M.

2927 Broadway

Houston, TX 77017

 

Court Documents

Pablo v. Jose (OP).pdf

eFile Original Petition: JURY FEE PAID & CITATION TO BE ISSUED

Original Petition CMCC RRR Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CMRRR- 7010-1870-0000-2788-3413

Letter to County Clerk (Pablo).pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Citation Returned

Citation Returned

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CMRRR- 7010-1870-0000-2788-3413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: JURY FEE PAID & CITATION TO BE ISSUED**NEED ISSUANCE FEE **

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walls, William M.