Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/10/2021 at 21:28:13 (UTC).

OVERSEAS MILITARY SALES CORPORATION - OMSC, LTD. VS DANIEL J. CHRISTINE

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 OVERSEAS MILITARY SALES CORPORATION - OMSC, LTD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANIEL J CHRISTINE. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0941

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Overseas Military Sales Corporation - OMSC, Ltd.

Defendant

Daniel J. Christine

Baytown, TX 77521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COFFMAN, JEREMY HEATH

100 Main Street

Fort Worth, TX 76102-3090

 

Court Documents

Return of Service

Return of Service

Christine__plaintiff_s_motion_for_substituted_service.pdf

Motion for Substituted Service

Christine__order_granting_motion_for_sub_service.pdf

Proposed Order: granting plaintiff's motion for substituted service

Order for Rule 106 (submitted).pdf

Order for Rule 106

Christine - copy fee paid.pdf

Request: Payment for service copies

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Daniel_Christine__POP.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: granting plaintiff's motion for substituted service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Payment for service copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OVERSEAS MILITARY SALES CORPORATION - OMSC, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Heath Coffman