This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/11/2022 at 12:52:23 (UTC).

OVERNIGHT CAPITAL LLC VS NISHANTKUMAR PATEL,DT 5STAR LLC

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 OVERNIGHT CAPITAL LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NISHANTKUMAR PATEL,DT 5STAR LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-804

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Overnight Capital LLC

Defendants

DT 5Star LLC

2766 Watson Boulevard

Centerville, GA 31028

Nishantkumar Patel

Centerville, GA 31028

Garnishor

Overnight Capital LLC.

Garnishee

Cadence Bank, N.A.

C/O Hank Holmes, 2800 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 3800

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Garnishor Attorney

Regent, Anh H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

Garnishee Attorney

CUNNINGHAM, KRISTINA LOUISE

Attorney at CRAIN, CATON & JAMES

1401 Mckinney, 17Th Fl Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

Cover Letter for Application for Writ of Garnishment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued

6060339-41456334-YB6dGsk3Tq84r7g.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

Order of Dismissal (submitted)

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Order of Dismissal

Proposed Order: Proposed Order of Dismissal

Notice of Non-Suit and Motion to Dismiss Writ of Garnishment

Motion for Non-Suit: and Motion to Dismiss Writ of Garnishment

Answer to Overnight Capital LLC v. Patel_ Nishantkumar et al(6067580.3).pdf

Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: and Motion to Dismiss Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Proposed Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment No-Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DT 5Star LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Overnight Capital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CADENCE BANK, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina L Cunningham