This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 16:39:36 (UTC).

NORBERTO A. BETANCOURT VS JONI SPRETZ,ROBERT KELLER

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 NORBERTO A BETANCOURT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JONI SPRETZ,ROBERT KELLER. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6539

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norberto A. Betancourt

Houston, TX 77223

Defendants

Jone Spretz

Deer Park, TX 77536

Robert Keller

Deer Park, TX 77536

Joni Spretz

Deer Park, TX 77536

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order

Order to Withdraw Funds

Proposed Order

Proposed Order

Motion to Withdraw Funds

Motion to Withdraw Funds

Notice of Submission

Notice of Submission

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment: DEFAULT

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL 198100435011 RECEIPT #2019-114 $1,600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY JONI ROSHELLE SPRETZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less