This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/13/2023 at 19:01:44 (UTC).

NASSAR JON AGHAJAN,NAJAFI MAJID VS GRISELDA LUNA LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 NASSAR JON AGHAJAN,NAJAFI MAJID filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GRISELDA LUNA LOPEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8111

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

AUDRIE LAWTON-EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nassar Jon Aghajan

Najafi Majid

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff

Griselda Luna Lopez

Counter Defendants

Nasser Jon Aghajan

Majid Najafi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, ERNESTO, III

Attorney at The Law Office of Ernie Garcia

2626 S Loop W Suite 630

Houston, TX 77054-5636

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

Donati, Keith S

Attorney at Donati, Brashear Law Firm

410 W. Grand Parkway S., Ste. 104

Katy, TX 77494

 

Court Documents

Notice of Passing Hearing on Jurisdiction of Defendant's Counterclaim

Notice: of Passing Hearing on Jurisdiction of Defendant's Counterclaim

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: To be deposit in the courts registry for (Rent-March) in the amount of $2,000.00

Order Denying Motion for Continuance- sent to Judge

Order Denied: Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Continuance

Notice of Trial 3.21.23.pdf

Notice of Trial From Party: Certified Mail Receipt

Order Denying Motion for Continuance.pdf

Proposed Order: Order Denying Defendant's Motion For Continuance

Response to Defendant's Motion for Continuance.pdf

Response: to Defendants Motion for Contiuance of First Trial and Motion for Scheduling Order

Exhibit 1

Response: to Plaintiffs' Notice of Default and Motion for Writ of Possession

Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Default and Motion for Writ of Possession

Response: to Plaintiffs' Notice of Default and Motion for Writ of Possession

Certified Mail Receipt

Notice: Certified Mail Receipt- proof

JP Motion

JP Motion: for Continuance

JP Motion

JP Motion: for Continuance

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Answer

JP Answer

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation

JP Citation

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

Paid Forcible

Paid Forcible: FILED AND PAID BY GRISELDA LUNA LOPEZ

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Passing Hearing on Jurisdiction of Defendant's Counterclaim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: To be deposit in the courts registry for (Rent-March) in the amount of $2,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Denied: Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Trial From Party: Certified Mail Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Denying Defendant's Motion For Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: to Defendants Motion for Contiuance of First Trial and Motion for Scheduling Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: to Plaintiffs' Notice of Default and Motion for Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Certified Mail Receipt- proof

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: to be deposited into the Registry of the Court- February Rent $2,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Granting Motion for Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Motion: for Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Motion: for Continuance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPaid Forcible: FILED AND PAID BY GRISELDA LUNA LOPEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less