This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/02/2021 at 15:07:09 (UTC).

NANCY SCHMADEKE VS KROGER TEXAS L.P.,THE KROGER CO.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 NANCY SCHMADEKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER TEXAS L P ,THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6271

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nancy Schmadeke

Defendants

Kroger Texas L.P.

Corporation Service Company 211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

The Kroger Co.

Corporation Service Company 211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Not Classified By Court

JACK A. ADAMS

Houston, TX 77095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hayter, Joel

8190 Barker Cypress Road Suite 1900, #1110

Cypress, TX 77433

Defendant Attorney

Akers, Brock C.

Attorney at The Akers Firm, PLLC

3401 Allen Parkway, Suite 101

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Original Petition

eFile Original Petition: Jury Fee Paid

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M\O ATTY

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M\O ATTY

Req for Citations - Nancy 10-8-21.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

003.pdf

Jury Fee

002.pdf

Answer

P287444_001.pdf

Return of Service

P287444_002.pdf

Return of Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M\O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M\O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Jury Fee Paid **SEE NOTES**

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.