Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/03/2017 at 14:02:46 (UTC).

MONITY VS. JEFF CLEM ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2014 MONITY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JEFF CLEM. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7417

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THERESA CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONITY

150 West Parker Road, Third Floor

Houston, TX 77076

Defendants

POPE BOBBY

Houston, TX 77065

MEDICAL MOBILE CONVERSIONS LLC

Bobby L Pope 11103 Jones Rd West

Houston, TX 77065

CLEM JEFF

Houston, TX 77065

A-ROD LP

Corporation Service Company Dba Csc-Lawyers Inc Serv Co 211 E 7Th St Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

BOBBY POPE

Houston, TX 77065

JEFF CLEM

Houston, TX 77065

Not Classified By Court

Bruce Bain

Houston, TX 77043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLARS RUTH MONTY

Attorney at MONTY & RAMIREZ LLP

150 West Parker Road, Third Floor

Houston, TX 77076

MONITY

Attorney at MONTY & RAMIREZ LLP

150 West Parker Road, Third Floor

Houston, TX 77076

WILLARS, RUTH MONTY

Attorney at MONTY & RAMIREZ LLP

150 West Parker Road, 3Rd Floor

Houston, TX 77076

Defendant Attorneys

Dieye, Papa M

Attorney at THE DIEYE FIRM

112 West 4Th Street

Houston, TX 77007

KRUEGER, CORY M.

2211 Norfolk Suite 211

Houston, TX 77098

VICKERS, ADEN L

4144 North Central Ex. Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75204

 

Court Documents

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Answer

Answer: ORIGINAL ANSWER OF JEFF CLEM Film code number CCCL-2014-371723

Crt 2-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 10-14-14 APPEARANCE DATE 11-10-14 Film code number CCCL-2014-387773

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Partial Non-Suited and Notice: PARTIAL NON SUIT AS TO DEFENDANT JEFF CLEM Film code number CCCL-2015-112633

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Partial Non-Suited and Notice: PARTIAL NON SUIT AS TO DEFENDANT JEFF CLEM Film code number CCCL-2015-112633

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Partial Non-Suited and Notice: PARTIAL NON SUIT AS TO DEFENDANT JEFF CLEM Film code number CCCL-2015-112633

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Partial Non-Suited and Notice: PARTIAL NON SUIT AS TO DEFENDANT JEFF CLEM Film code number CCCL-2015-112633

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Answer

Answer: DEFENDANT A-ROD, LP D/B/A ALEX RODRIGUEZ MERCEDES BENZ'S ORIGINAL ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE Film code number CCCL-2014-224661

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 10-14-14 APPEARANCE DATE 11-10-14 Film code number CCCL-2014-376018

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 10-14-14 APPEARANCE DATE 10-27-14 Film code number CCCL-2014-388809

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 2-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Not Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: NOTICE AND ORDER OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT & ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Submission: NOT SET Film code number CCCL-2015-114375

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: DEFENDANT A-ROD LP DBA ALEX RODRIGUEZ MERCEDES BENZS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL NO EVIDENCE SUMMARY JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-114244

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dieye, Papa M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUEGER, CORY M.