Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/16/2017 at 08:37:20 (UTC).

MOH MOHEB VS. MATT DIZJIYAN ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/24/2014 MOH MOHEB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATT DIZJIYAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA STOREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6830

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA STOREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOHEB MOH

MOH MOHEB

Defendants

MOMENI HARRY

Houston, TX 77079

DIZJIYAN MATT

Sugar Land, TX 77479

PRUDENTIAL AUTO LLC

Harry Momeni 11155 Westpark Dr

Houston, TX 77042

MATT DIZJIYAN

Sugar Land, TX 77479

HARRY MOMENI

Houston, TX 77079-2521

Not Classified By Court

Norman L. Roser

Houston, TX 77027

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SAXE GREGG K

6666 Harwin Dr, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77036

Saxe, Gregg K

6666 Harwin Dr., Suite 600

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant Attorneys

MOMENI, PEYMAN AZANDARYANI

2500 West Loop South Ste 450

Houston, TX 77027

PORTZ III, CHARLES H

411 Fannin St Ste 200

Houston, TX 77002-2040

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Jury Fee

Jury Fee

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Certificate of Written Discovery

Certificate of Written Discovery

Certificate of Transfer To be Issued

Certificate of Transfer To be Issued

Notice

Notice

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 01-13-14 APPEARANCE DATE 02-09-15 Film code number CCCL-2015-18624

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 01-13-15 APPEARANCE DATE 02-09-15 Film code number CCCL-2015-18649

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 01-13-15 APPEARANCE DATE 02-09-15 Film code number CCCL-2016-172525

Answer

Answer: DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER FILED BY PEYMAN MOMENI Film code number CCCL-2015-38593

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC-A

Crt 3-Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC-A

Certificate of Written Discovery

Certificate of Written Discovery

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Transfer To be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Change of Venue Granted: UNOPPOSED ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-252234

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT Film code number CCCL-2015-251933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT, ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Subpoena Returned: TO SUMMON RANINDER SEHGAL CPA Film code number CCCL-2015-191340

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition Disclosures Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Jury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PORTZ III, CHARLES H