This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/07/2020 at 11:48:45 (UTC).

MICHAEL W PALMER VS JAY ZHANG

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 MICHAEL W PALMER filed an Other lawsuit against JAY ZHANG. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6672

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael W Palmer

Kerrville, TX 78028

Defendant

Jay Zhang

Houston, TX 77019

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

49 San Jacinto Suite 220

Houston, TX 77002-1233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BEGLE , BRIAN J

Attorney at OLSON & OLSON

2727 Allen Parkway, Ste 600

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE

Proposed Order

PLAINTIFF S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

Motion for Non-Suit

ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Opposition to Motion to Recuse.pdf

Opposition: Opposition to Motion to Recuse

Proposed Order Denying Motion to Recuse.pdf

Proposed Order

Opposition to Mediation of Defendant Jay Zhang.pdf

Objections: Opposition to Mediation of Defendant, Jay Zhang (no notice not set)

NOTICE TO RECUSAL OF DEFENDANT ATTORNEY.pdf

Notice: NOTICE TO RECUSAL OF DEFENDANT ATTORNEY

Notice to oral hearing over restraining order

Notice of Hearing: *Not Set; No Date in Notice

CEASE AND Desist Order

eFile Original Petition: with Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs

NNB NEWS vs Zhang Petition

eFile Original Petition: with Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs

PLAINTIFF affidavit

eFile Original Petition: with Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs

Evidence 1A About NNB NEWS .pdf

eFile Original Petition: with Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs

RESTRAINING ORDER

eFile Original Petition: with Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs

Current Addresses for both the Plaintiff and Defendant.pdf

eFile Original Petition: with Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs

Evidence 1B City Defendants' Notice of Submission

eFile Original Petition: with Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs

Evidence 1 C motion to dismiss

eFile Original Petition: with Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition: Opposition to Motion to Recuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: NOTICE TO RECUSAL OF DEFENDANT ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjections: Opposition to Mediation of Defendant, Jay Zhang (no notice not set)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Order Sustaining Objection to Mediation and Withdrawing Referral to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: MOTION TO RECUSAL OF DEFENDANT ATTORNEY (no notice not set)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Answer to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreement: Electronic Service Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: *Not Set; No Date in Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: with Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Costs

    Read MoreRead Less