This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/13/2023 at 23:31:33 (UTC).

MICHAEL GALATIAN VS ALOIS ROY STARY

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 MICHAEL GALATIAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALOIS ROY STARY. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MANPREET SINGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3855

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MANPREET SINGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Galatian

Defendant

Alois Roy Stary

Pasadena, TX 77503

Not Classified By Court

Dispute Resolution Center

Dispute Resolution Center, Harris County Annex 21

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FILGUEIRA, SEBASTIAN JONATHAN

Attorney at LOZANO LAW OFFICES, P.C.

604 E. Highway 6

Alvin, TX 77511

 

Court Documents

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET CRT #4

22.06.15.OriginalPetition.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

22.06.15.CivilProcessRequest.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

Original Answer.pdf

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation to DRC

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation to DRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET CRT #4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dispute Resolution Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Filgueira, Sebastain Jonathan