This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:36:05 (UTC).

MICHAEL ASMELASH VS SHALONDA BROOKS

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MICHAEL ASMELASH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHALONDA BROOKS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6616

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Asmelash

Houston, TX 77093

Defendant

Shalonda Brooks

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

Letter returned

Letter returned: From Angeles Villafranca - Unclaimed

Letter returned

Letter returned: From Angeles Villafranca - Unclaimed

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Order for Trial Setting - Unclaimed

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Order of Dismissal

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY SHALONDA BROOKS

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal: #2

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court

Letter from Justice of the Peace Court: FROM SOTO, SADITH

JP Notice

JP Notice: WRIT OF POSSESSION #1

JP Notice

JP Notice: WRIT OF POSSESSION #2

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Order for Trial Setting - Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter returned: From Angeles Villafranca - Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter returned: From Angeles Villafranca - Unclaimed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY SHALONDA BROOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal: #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal: #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter from Justice of the Peace Court: FROM SOTO, SADITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: WRIT OF POSSESSION #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: WRIT OF POSSESSION #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less