Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/03/2017 at 12:16:37 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS VS. SIX WESTHEIMER LTD ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2011 METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SIX WESTHEIMER LTD. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA STOREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **9688

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA STOREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY OF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

Defendants

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

% Don Sumners 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY

% Don Sumners 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

GREATER EAST END MANAGEMENT DIST

% Don Sumners 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77002

UNION PLANTERS BANK NA

211 E 7Th St Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE SYSTEM

% Don Sumners 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

% Don Sumners 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

%Don Sumners 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

BOKF, NA dba Bank of Texas

1019 Brazos St Room #214

Austin, TX 78701

CVS PHARMACY INC

350 N St Paul St #2900

Dallas, TX 75201

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

% Don Sumner 1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

SIX WESTHEIMER LTD

BANK OF TEXAS N A

REGIONS BANK

211 E 7Th St Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Not Classified By Court

Michael S Narsete

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUNKIN, FREDERICK D

Attorney at ANDREWS & KURTH

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

MONTAGUE, HAROLD DIXON

Attorney at VINSON & ELKINS LLP

1001 Fannin Street Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: STATE OF TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE Film code number CCCL-2011-143259

Letter

Letter: FROM FREDERICK D. JUNKIN Film code number CCCL-2011-143691

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2011-159240

Letter

Letter: FROM GEORGE R. MURPHY Film code number CCCL-2012-126773

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Order Granted

Order Granted: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER Film code number CCCL-2012-403133

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 3-Motion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settle

Crt 3-Motion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settle

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Condemnation

Condemnation: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2011-143717

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2011-188007

Bond

Bond: SURETY FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY Film code number CCCL-2012-38711

Order for Continuance

Order for Continuance: GRANTED Film code number CCCL-2012-444213

Request

Request: FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER Film code number CCCL-2013-94481

Crt 3-Motion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settle

Crt 3-Motion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settle

Notice

Notice: OF DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2014-264774

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Check Disbursement: -901 Film code number CCCL-2014-350099

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Withdrawal: -901 Film code number CCCL-2014-316184

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Withdraw Funds: -901 GRANTED Film code number CCCL-2014-289594

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: DEFENDANTS SIX WESTHEIMER, LTDS MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEPOSIT Film code number CCCL-2014-285526

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing: WITHDRAW FUNDS Film code number CCCL-2014-271379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: MOTION ORDER AND NOTICE TO WITHDRAW FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: OF DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2014-264774

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • Court Registry Deposit: Deposit made for $166194.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Funds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT $ 166,194.00 TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) Film code number CCCL-2014-261942

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: STATE OF TEXAS SECRETARY OF STATE Film code number CCCL-2011-143259

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS GRANTED 08/31/11 Film code number CCCL-2011-37616

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREATER EAST END MANAGEMENT DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of Texas is a litigant

Latest cases where Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant