Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/02/2017 at 00:51:40 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHCT VS. CITY OF HO ETAL ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/14/2009 METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHCT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CITY OF HO ETAL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7227

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHCT

Defendants

SYMEONIDIS GUS ETAL

Houston, TX 77096

HOUSTON COMMUNITY CS ETAL

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

BANK OF TEXAS NA ETAL

333 West Campbell Rd #360

Richardson, TX 75080

HARRIS CTY FLD CD ETAL

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS CTY HOSP DIST ETAL

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

SYMEONIDIS K*AKA*ETAL

Houston, TX 77096

PORT OF HO AUTH ETAL

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

TAX ASSESSOR & CHCT ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

CITY OF HO ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

SYMEONIDIS COSTAS*AKA*ETA

Houston, TX 77096

GREATER EAST END MD ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS CTY EDUCATN D ETAL

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON ISD ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

SYMEONIDIS EFTERPI*AKA*ET

Houston, TX 77096

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUNKIN, FREDERICK D

Attorney at ANDREWS & KURTH

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

MURPHY III, GEORGE R

Attorney at VINSON & ELKINS LLP

1001 Fannin Street Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Original Petition (Filing Fee)

Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION OF METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHY HARRIS CTY TX METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHY HARRIS CTY TX VS GUS SYMEONIDIS ETAL Film code Number 768923758

Cash Receipt

Cash Receipt: CR #643912 AMT $172.00 PAID BY ANDREWS & KURTH METROPOLITAN TRANSIT ETC VS SYMEONIDIS GUS ETC ETAL FILING FEE FOR CONDEMNATION Film code Number 768923757

Order

Order: APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS GRANTED Film code Number 768940835

Statement

Statement: SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS STATEMENT OF SERV Film code Number 777885881

Acknowledgement

Acknowledgement: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECPT OF NOTC AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERV Film code Number 777885894

Oath

Oath: OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code Number 777821847

Notice

Notice: OF ORAL HEARING OF BANK OF TX NA Film code Number 777885906

Notice

Notice: OF ORAL HEARING TO TAX ASSESSOR & COLLECTOR HARRIS CTY TX, HOUSTON ISD, HARRIS CTY FLD CONTROL DIST, PORT OF HO AUTHY, HARRRIS CTY EDUCATN DEPT, HARRIS CTY HOSP DIST, HOUSTON COMMUN COL SYSTM, CITY OF HO, AND GREATER EAST END MGMT DIST Film code Number 777885884

Award

Award: AWARD FILED 12/8/09 IN THE AMT OF $785,000.00 SPECIAL COMNRS FEES SET AT $750.00 EACH JUDGE SIGNED 12/17/09 Film code Number 777885937

Letter

Letter: FROM MARK L MERRELL Film code Number 794896203

Legacy Event

Legacy Event: Legacy events: TR COND; CR #728590 AMT $145996.00 PAID BY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHC VS SYMEONIDIS GUS ETAL CONDEMNATION TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) Film code Number 794896202

Notice

Notice: OF ORAL HEARING Film code Number 794916812

Motion

Motion: TO WITHDRAW DEPOSIT Film code Number 794916809

Letter

Letter: FROM GEORGE R MURPHY Film code Number 794916821

Order

Order: WITHDRAWING DEPOSIT GRANTED Film code Number 795886238

Certificate

Certificate: TAX CERTIFICATE Film code Number 795872321

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 796812531

Withdraw

Withdraw: CERTIFICATE ON CT ORD AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF FUNDS FROM THE REGISTRY OF THE CT TO GUS SYMEONIDIS ETAL $145,996.00 Film code Number 796834223

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Withdraw: CERTIFICATE ON CT ORD AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF FUNDS FROM THE REGISTRY OF THE CT TO GUS SYMEONIDIS ETAL $145,996.00 Film code Number 796834223

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 796812531

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate: TAX CERTIFICATE Film code Number 795872321

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: WITHDRAWING DEPOSIT GRANTED Film code Number 795886238

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM GEORGE R MURPHY Film code Number 794916821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: TO WITHDRAW DEPOSIT Film code Number 794916809

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: OF ORAL HEARING Film code Number 794916812

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Legacy Event: Legacy events: TR COND; CR #728590 AMT $145996.00 PAID BY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHC VS SYMEONIDIS GUS ETAL CONDEMNATION TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) Film code Number 794896202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM MARK L MERRELL Film code Number 794896203

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: FO DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO FINAL JUDG Film code Number 794896204

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Award: AWARD FILED 12/8/09 IN THE AMT OF $785,000.00 SPECIAL COMNRS FEES SET AT $750.00 EACH JUDGE SIGNED 12/17/09 Film code Number 777885937

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: OF ORAL HEARING TO TAX ASSESSOR & COLLECTOR HARRIS CTY TX, HOUSTON ISD, HARRIS CTY FLD CONTROL DIST, PORT OF HO AUTHY, HARRRIS CTY EDUCATN DEPT, HARRIS CTY HOSP DIST, HOUSTON COMMUN COL SYSTM, CITY OF HO, AND GREATER EAST END MGMT DIST Film code Number 777885884

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: OF ORAL HEARING OF BANK OF TX NA Film code Number 777885906

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath: OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code Number 777821847

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgement: ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECPT OF NOTC AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERV Film code Number 777885894

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement: SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS STATEMENT OF SERV Film code Number 777885881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS GRANTED Film code Number 768940835

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Cash Receipt: CR #643912 AMT $172.00 PAID BY ANDREWS & KURTH METROPOLITAN TRANSIT ETC VS SYMEONIDIS GUS ETC ETAL FILING FEE FOR CONDEMNATION Film code Number 768923757

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION OF METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHY HARRIS CTY TX METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHY HARRIS CTY TX VS GUS SYMEONIDIS ETAL Film code Number 768923758

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORT OF HO AUTHY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS CTY HOSP DIST is a litigant

Latest cases where Metropolitan Transit Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of Texas is a litigant